Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Budimir, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618BornBosnia Argentina
8 Feb 166749.1SelectedBishop of Pedena, Austria
1 Oct 166850.8ConfirmedBishop of Pedena, Austria
30 Dec 166851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pedena, Austria
3 Apr 167052.3DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

MicroData Summary for Paul Budimir:
Bishop Paul Budimir O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Pedena

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 311

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013