Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jože Pogacnik

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1902Born
25 Jul 192724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
28 Feb 196360.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
28 Feb 196360.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
7 Apr 196360.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
2 Mar 196461.4AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
23 Feb 198077.4RetiredArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
25 Mar 198077.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Jože Pogacnik
Archbishop Jože Pogacnik (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKovor

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast