Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz von Raigesfeld, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

Titular Bishop of Derbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1736BornGraz
1752¹15.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
25 Aug 176528.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
1 Sep 176528.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
177740.1IncardinatedPriest of Trieste, Italy
1 Jun 179558.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
1 Jun 179558.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Derbe
8 Oct 179558.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Derbe
16 Jul 180063.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz von Raigesfeld
Bishop Franz von Raigesfeld S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 31
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 193, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016