Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Christoph von Herberstein

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1644³Born
25 Jul 166723.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
31 Jul 166723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
21 Apr 168339.1SelectedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
6 Dec 168339.8ConfirmedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
1 May 168440.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
24 May 170157.2ResignedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
20 Jul 171672.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Christoph von Herberstein
Bishop Sigmund Christoph von Herberstein (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGraz

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018