Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anton Stres, C.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1942 BornDonacka Gora
28 Mar 196724.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
20 Apr 196825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
13 May 200057.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maribor, Slovenia
13 May 200057.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Poetovium
24 Jun 200057.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Poetovium
7 Apr 200663.3AppointedBishop of Celje, Slovenia
21 May 200663.4InstalledBishop of Celje, Slovenia
31 Jan 200966.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Maribor, Slovenia
28 Nov 200967.0AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
24 Jan 201067.1InstalledArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
31 Jul 201370.6ResignedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Anton Stres:
Archbishop Anton Stres C.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ljubljana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,791
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013