Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigismund Ernst von Hohenwart, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1745BornCelje
23 Aug 176722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
24 Jun 176823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 Dec 181469.5AppointedBishop of Linz, Austria
7 May 181569.9Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
15 May 181569.9InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
22 Apr 182579.8DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Ernst von Hohenwart:
Bishop Sigismund Ernst von Hohenwart O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 24
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016