Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Grzegorz Wojtarowicz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1791³BornSzynwald
17 Aug 181726.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Aug 181726.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 184049.1SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
13 Jul 184049.3ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
22 Nov 184049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
29 Nov 184049.7InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland
15 Jul 185059.3ResignedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
31 May 187584.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Józef Grzegorz Wojtarowicz:
Bishop Józef Grzegorz Wojtarowicz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,786
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,800
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013