Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Károly Eszterházy de Galantha

Deceased

Bishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1725³BornPresburg
23 Dec 174722.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
30 Mar 174822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
6 Nov 175934.5SelectedBishop of Vác, Hungary
3 Mar 176034.8ConfirmedBishop of Vác, Hungary
20 Apr 176035.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vác, Hungary
10 Oct 176136.4SelectedBishop of Eger, Hungary
19 Apr 176237.0ConfirmedBishop of Eger, Hungary
15 Mar 179973.9DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Károly Eszterházy de Galantha:
Bishop Károly Eszterházy de Galantha (born , died ) Bishop of Eger

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 70, and Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 22 Sep 2013