Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignác Batthyány

Deceased

Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1741³BornNemetujvar
29 Apr 176422.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
16 Jun 176422.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 178038.9SelectedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
25 Jun 178139.9ConfirmedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
5 Aug 178140.0Ordained BishopBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
17 Nov 179857.3DiedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignác Batthyány:
Bishop Ignác Batthyány (born , died ) Bishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 413
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015