Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Zichy

Deceased

Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1700³Born
1 Apr 172423.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Esztergom, Hungary
15 Apr 172423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Sep 174241.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Sep 174241.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Botrys
28 Oct 174242.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Botrys
9 Dec 174343.1SelectedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
16 Mar 174443.4ConfirmedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
18 Jun 178382.6DiedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Zichy
Bishop Ferenc Zichy (born , died ) Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHommonensi
Ordained BishopWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 128, and Page 241
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,226

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 28 Jun 2020

Quantcast