Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Johann Georg Dehm, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) Emeritus of Moldavia

Titular Bishop of Colophon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1825Born
19 May 184621.0Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Aug 184722.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Mar 184822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Jan 187852.6AppointedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia
15 Jan 187852.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
17 Mar 187852.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colophon
11 Sep 188055.3ResignedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) of Moldavia
17 May 188358.0DiedApostolic Visitor (Visitator) Emeritus of Moldavia

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Johann Georg Dehm (VIAF: 170969084)
Bishop Fidelis Johann Georg Dehm O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Apostolic Visitor (Visitator) Emeritus of Moldavia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePechtensweiler, Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
Ordained BishopXII Apostles, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 216
  • c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,395
  • c34: CB, 19 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,658
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017