Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Antonio Micaleff (Micallef), O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1818Born
6 Mar 184122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
21 Dec 186345.5AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
10 Jan 186445.6Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
27 Oct 187153.4AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
8 Mar 188364.8DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Antonio Micaleff (Micallef)
Archbishop Paolo Antonio Micaleff (Micallef) O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Valletta, Malta
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 206, and Page 455
  • bp/c34: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1864, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017