Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Biscioni Amadori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Thebae

Secretary of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1812Born
11 Mar 183724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
23 Feb 187259.3AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
10 Mar 187259.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
24 Aug 187562.8AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
23 Sep 187562.9ResignedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
23 Sep 187562.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
1883¹70.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Biscioni Amadori
Archbishop Luigi Biscioni Amadori (born , died 1883) Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle di Calci, Archdiocese of Pisa
Ordained BishopPisa, Archdiocese of Pisa

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 164, and Page 545
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017