Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Ghilardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1827Born
21 Sep 185023.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 187548.0AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
4 Apr 187548.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
20 Jul 190477.3DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Ghilardi (VIAF: 88813993)
Archbishop Nicola Ghilardi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastiglione di Garfagnana
Error (2)Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 350
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017