Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Benini (Bedini)

Deceased

Bishop of Pescia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1812Born
23 Nov 183422.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 185543.3AppointedBishop of Pescia, Italy
1 Nov 185543.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pescia, Italy
27 Apr 189683.9DiedBishop of Pescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Benini (Bedini) (VIAF: 88755575)
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Benini (Bedini) (born , died ) Bishop of Pescia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrato
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 456
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Mar 2017