Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Stefanowicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1801Born
20 Dec 182322.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
3 Oct 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
16 Nov 185453.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
16 Nov 185453.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
1 Jan 185553.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
23 Mar 187169.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Stefanowicz
Bishop Franciszek Stefanowicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMosina, Diocese of Poznań
Ordained BishopS. Claude des Bourguignons, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 497
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1855, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016