Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Jakób Bogedain

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Hebron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1810Born
22 Jun 183524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
21 Dec 185747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
21 Dec 185747.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hebron
9 May 185847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hebron
17 Oct 186050.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Jakób Bogedain
Bishop Bernard Jakób Bogedain (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFröbel, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017