Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Cybichowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Cinna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1828Born
14 Jun 185123.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
14 Nov 185224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
20 Oct 186638.5SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
12 Jul 186739.2ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
12 Jul 186739.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cinna
27 Oct 186739.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cinna
6 Mar 188758.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Cybichowski (VIAF: 311739925)
Bishop Józef Cybichowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObjezierze, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017