Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrian Włodarski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Titular Bishop of Ibora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1807Born
25 Mar 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Mar 186154.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
18 Mar 186154.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ibora
2 Jun 186154.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ibora
30 May 187568.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

MicroData Summary for Adrian Włodarski (VIAF: 54958766)
Bishop Adrian Włodarski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNieder Heiduck, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Ordained BishopBishop's, Chapel, Breslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)
Death PlaceBreslau, Diocese of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017