Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Humberto Pinzón Güiza, I.M.C.

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano

Titular Bishop of Ottocium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1969 BornBerbeo
6 Jan 199121.5ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
5 Jul 199728.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Consolata Missionaries
7 Aug 199930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
21 Feb 201343.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano, Colombia
21 Feb 201343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ottocium
20 Apr 201343.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ottocium

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Humberto Pinzón Güiza:
Bishop Joaquín Humberto Pinzón Güiza I.M.C. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2013
  • ob: CB, 6 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,767

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013