Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán

Dioecesis Sancti Vincentii



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 30 May 2019
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Florencia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 38,000 (14,677 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curia Episcopal, Carrera 5 N. 5-29, San Vicente del Caguan, Caqueta, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)4644.206; 4644.478
  • Fax: 4644.287

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo
9 December 1985ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Florencia Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo (erected)
21 February 2013SplitVicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente
21 February 2013SplitVicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Leguízamo-Solano
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente del Caguán
26 November 2013Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of San Vicente Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente del Caguán
Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán
30 May 2019ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of San Vicente del Caguán Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán
13 July 2019Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of San Vicente del Caguán (from Ibagué to Florencia)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo
1990207,000212,00097.6%1171811,500221211ap1991
1999130,000150,00086.7%921304,333251715ap2000
2000130,000150,00086.7%823314,193281715ap2001
2001130,000150,00086.7%1023333,939301915ap2002
2002120,000150,00080.0%825333,636322032ap2003
2003120,000150,00080.0%423274,444362216ap2004
2004120,000150,00080.0%725323,750352218ap2005
2010134,000164,00081.7%922314,322262318ap2011
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente
201384,00096,00087.5%816243,5001612bul:21Feb2013
Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente del Caguán
201490,000110,00081.8%711185,000141714ap2015
201793,000113,53081.9%812204,650161514ap2018
Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán
201893,000113,53081.9%812204,650161514bul:30May2019

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.9, 9 Jun 2019; Data: 10 Sep 2019

Quantcast