Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cuniberti, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Florencia

Titular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Cypro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1921BornMondovž-Breo, Italy
29 Jun 194423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
18 Apr 196140.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Florencia, Colombia
18 Apr 196140.1AppointedTitular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Cypro
21 May 196140.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Cypro
15 Nov 197857.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Florencia, Colombia
26 Jun 201291.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Florencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cuniberti:
Bishop Angelo Cuniberti I.M.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Florencia

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015