Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Enrique Jiménez Carvajal, C.I.M.

Archbishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1942 BornBucaramanga
17 May 196422.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
17 Jun 196725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
9 Nov 199250.6AppointedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
12 Dec 199250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
6 Feb 200461.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
24 Oct 200563.6SucceededArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Enrique Jiménez Carvajal:
Archbishop Jorge Enrique Jiménez Carvajal C.I.M. (born ) Archbishop of Cartagena

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cartagena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013