Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Darío de Jesús Monsalve Mejía

Archbishop of Cali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1948 BornValparaiso
17 Oct 197628.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 199345.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
7 Oct 199345.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Mauretania
15 Nov 199345.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Mauretania
25 Jul 200153.3AppointedBishop of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
3 Jun 201062.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cali, Colombia
1 Aug 201062.3InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Cali, Colombia
18 May 201163.1SucceededArchbishop of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Darío de Jesús Monsalve Mejía:
Archbishop Darío de Jesús Monsalve Mejía (born ) Archbishop of Cali

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 18 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015