Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rigoberto Corredor Bermúdez

Bishop of Pereira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1948 BornArabia
18 Nov 197325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pereira, Colombia
26 Feb 198839.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pereira, Colombia
26 Feb 198839.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
26 Mar 198839.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
30 Nov 199648.3AppointedBishop of Buenaventura, Colombia
19 Dec 200355.4AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
15 Jul 201162.9AppointedBishop of Pereira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rigoberto Corredor Bermúdez:
Bishop Rigoberto Corredor Bermúdez (born ) Bishop of Pereira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pereira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,717
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013