Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Óscar González Villa

Deceased

Priest of Manizales, Colombia

Titular See: (resigned before consecration)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1949Born
17 Nov 197324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Manizales, Colombia
24 Apr 200656.9AppointedBishop of Girardota, Colombia
10 Jun 200657.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Girardota, Colombia
25 Jun 201566.1DiedPriest of Manizales, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Óscar González Villa
Father Óscar González Villa (born , died ) Priest of Manizales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlcalá
Death PlaceManizales, Archdiocese of Manizales

  • a priest for 41.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2006
  • ob/i/r: CB
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017