Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio de Jesús Morales Grisales, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Mocoa-Sibundoy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1934 BornNeira
4 Oct 195925.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
15 Apr 199156.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sibundoy, Colombia
15 Apr 199156.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Budua
15 Jun 199156.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Budua
29 Oct 199965.3AppointedBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
18 Oct 200369.2ResignedBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Fabio de Jesús Morales Grisales:
Bishop Fabio de Jesús Morales Grisales C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mocoa-Sibundoy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mocoa-Sibundoy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013