Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Arcadio Bernal Supelano, C.SS.R.

Bishop Emeritus of Líbano-Honda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1934 BornZipaquirá
22 Oct 195217.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Jan 195924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Feb 197843.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sibundoy, Colombia
27 Feb 197843.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
15 Apr 197843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
29 Mar 199055.3AppointedBishop of Arauca, Colombia
10 Jan 200368.1AppointedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
25 Mar 200368.3InstalledBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
28 Feb 200469.3ResignedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Arcadio Bernal Supelano:
Bishop Rafael Arcadio Bernal Supelano C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Líbano-Honda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Líbano-Honda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013