Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Efrén Rincón Rojas, C.SS.R.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Carreño

Titular Bishop of Bettonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1933 BornCalvario
25 Apr 196229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Dec 199966.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Carreño, Colombia
22 Dec 199966.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bettonium
24 Mar 200066.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bettonium
10 Jun 201077.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Puerto Carreño, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Efrén Rincón Rojas:
Bishop Alvaro Efrén Rincón Rojas C.SS.R. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Carreño

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Carreño.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: CB, 22 Oct 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,722

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015