Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Rafael Zarama Pasqualetto

Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1958 Born
27 Nov 199334.9Ordained PriestPriest of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
27 Jul 200950.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
27 Jul 200950.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
29 Sep 200950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
5 Jul 201758.6AppointedBishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Luis Rafael Zarama Pasqualetto
Bishop Luis Rafael Zarama Pasqualetto (born ) Bishop of Raleigh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePasto, Diocese of Pasto, Colombia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Raleigh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,285
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Jul 2017