Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Prescott Talley

Coadjutor Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1950 BornColumbus, GA
1974¹23.3Converted
3 Jun 198938.7Ordained PriestPriest of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
3 Jan 201362.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
3 Jan 201362.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
2 Apr 201362.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
21 Sep 201666.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA
7 Nov 201666.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Alexandria, Louisiana, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for David Prescott Talley
Bishop David Prescott Talley (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Alexandria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alexandria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 3 Jan 2013
  • c2: CB, 28 Jan 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,666
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2016
  • i: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Sep 2016