Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregory John Hartmayer, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA


Motto: Pax Et Bonum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1951 Born
15 Aug 197018.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Aug 197321.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
5 May 197927.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Jul 201159.6AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
18 Oct 201159.9Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
5 Mar 202068.2AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
6 May 202068.4InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary
Gregory John Hartmayer
Archbishop Gregory John Hartmayer O.F.M. Conv.
(born )
Archbishop of Atlanta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo, NY, Diocese of Buffalo, New York
Ordained PriestImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Albany, Diocese of Albany, New York
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Savannah, Diocese of Savannah, Georgia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Atlanta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 19 Jul 2011
  • c1+: CB, 20 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,178
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2020
  • i: CB, 5 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 19 May 2025