Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Stephen Douglas Parkes

Bishop-Elect of Savannah, Georgia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1965 Born
23 May 199832.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orlando, Florida, USA
8 Jul 202055.0AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
23 Sep 202055.3Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Douglas Parkes
Father Stephen Douglas Parkes (born ) Bishop-Elect of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMineola, NY, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York
Ordained PriestSt. James, Cathedral, Orlando, Diocese of Orlando, Florida
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral Basilica, Savannah, Diocese of Savannah, Georgia

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Savannah.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2020
  • mn/ob/c1: CB, 8 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jul 2020

Quantcast