Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Guillermo González

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1822¹Born
1846¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 187351.2AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
21 Sep 187351.7Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
29 May 188260.4ResignedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
4 Jan 188866.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Guillermo González
Bishop Joaquín Guillermo González (born 1822, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellin, Diocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopMedellin, Diocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017