Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel María Negueruela Mendi

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1811Born
18 May 185948.2SelectedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
26 Sep 185948.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Nov 185948.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba
30 Jun 186150.4DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Cuba

MicroData Summary for Manuel María Negueruela Mendi (VIAF: 89263127)
Archbishop Manuel María Negueruela Mendi (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Cuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavarrete, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain, Spain
Ordained BishopSalesas, Madrid

  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 167, Number 921
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Jan 2017