Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Argüelles Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1798Born
1826²27.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 185860.8AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
27 Mar 185961.0Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Sep 187072.5DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Argüelles Miranda
Bishop Fernando Argüelles Miranda (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabaños de Arriba, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Chapel, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 167, Number 920
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast