Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Sánchez Cid y Carrascal, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1789Born
1812¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 181324.2ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
5 Aug 185263.5SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
27 Sep 185263.6ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
5 Dec 185263.8Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
14 Feb 185869.0DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Sánchez Cid y Carrascal
Bishop Antonio María Sánchez Cid y Carrascal C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFregenal de la Sierra
Ordained BishopSalesas, Monastery, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,501
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 161, Number 882
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018