Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Uraga Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1771Born
11 Oct 182756.1SelectedBishop of Guadix, Spain
28 Jan 182856.4ConfirmedBishop of Guadix, Spain
20 Jul 182856.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
3 Sep 184069.0DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Uraga Pérez
Bishop José Uraga Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaracaldo

  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 208
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 145, Number 790
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1828, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018