Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gennaro Romano

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1803BornNapoli
9 Jun 182723.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 184642.7SelectedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
21 Dec 184643.0ConfirmedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
27 Dec 184643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
17 Jun 185450.5ResignedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
6 Mar 185551.2SelectedBishop of Acerra, Italy
23 Mar 185551.2ConfirmedBishop of Acerra, Italy
26 Mar 186460.2DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gennaro Romano (VIAF: 154043859)
Bishop Giuseppe Gennaro Romano (born , died ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72, and Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1846, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016