Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Mazzuoli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche)

Titular Bishop of Hemeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1811BornCitta della Pieve
20 Sep 183423.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 184635.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of San Severino (Marche), Italy
21 Dec 184635.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipatris
27 Dec 184635.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipatris
4 Oct 184736.6AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
11 Feb 188977.9ResignedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
11 Feb 188977.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hemeria
16 Dec 189079.8DiedBishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche), Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Mazzuoli (VIAF: 89189583)
Bishop Francesco Mazzuoli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1886
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110, and Page 306
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 516
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1846, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016