Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Hurmuz, C.M.V. †

Deceased

Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Titular Archbishop of Siunia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1797¹Born
17 Jan 181922.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
14 Aug 184649.6AppointedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia
14 Aug 184649.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Siunia
23 Aug 184649.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Siunia
12 Apr 187679.2DiedAbbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Hurmuz (VIAF: 21661279)
Archbishop Georges Hurmuz C.M.V. (born 1797, died ) Abbot General of Congregazione Mechitarista di Venezia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConstantinople, Turkey

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 522
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1846, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018