Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Brigante Colonna

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati e Loreto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1807BornTivoli
5 Jun 183022.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 184537.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
16 Feb 184537.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
27 Jul 184638.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
29 May 185547.5DiedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Brigante Colonna (VIAF: 88762128)
Archbishop Francesco Brigante Colonna (born , died ) Bishop of Recanati e Loreto

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 478
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016