Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Bottazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1800Born
20 Dec 182323.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 184544.9SelectedBishop of Larino, Italy
24 Nov 184545.1ConfirmedBishop of Larino, Italy
8 Dec 184545.2Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
15 Apr 184948.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Termoli, Italy
5 Sep 185150.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Termoli, Italy
22 Jul 185857.8DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bottazzi
Bishop Pietro Bottazzi (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLacedonia
Ordained BishopSS. TrinitÓ a Montecitorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 549
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,845, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast