Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Isidore Godelle, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1806BornHannapes, France
1 Jun 183327.2Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Apr 185751.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India
3 Apr 185751.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
27 Aug 185751.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
21 Mar 186155.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India
15 Jul 186761.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Pondicherry, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Isidore Godelle:
Bishop Joseph-Isidore Godelle M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Pondicherry

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013