Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dalmazio (Pietro) d’Andrea, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1800Born
5 Jun 182020.1ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Jul 182323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Jun 185656.1SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
18 Sep 185656.4ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
28 Sep 185656.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
12 Oct 187070.5DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dalmazio (Pietro) d’Andrea
Bishop Dalmazio (Pietro) d’Andrea O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Concezione dei Cappuccini, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBova, Diocese of Bova

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017