Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Massoni

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne

Apostolic Delegate to Argentina

Apostolic Delegate to Chile

Apostolic Delegate to Paraguay

Apostolic Delegate to Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1808Born
18 Sep 183022.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 185648.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
6 Jul 185648.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
26 Sep 185648.6AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
26 Sep 185648.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
26 Sep 185648.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
26 Sep 185648.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
26 Sep 185648.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
3 Jun 185749.3DiedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Massoni (VIAF: 89259928)
Archbishop Vincenzo Massoni (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace of the Quirinale, Pauline, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1856, Number 22
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858, Page 338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017