Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria de Marinis

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1809Born
16 Jun 183222.7Ordained PriestPriest of L’Aquila, Italy
18 Jun 185646.7SelectedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
18 Sep 185647.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
28 Sep 185647.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
27 Aug 187767.9DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria de Marinis
Archbishop Luigi Maria de Marinis (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceL'Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Concezione dei Cappuccini, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 545
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1856, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017