Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico de Giacomo

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1815BornMusellaro
4 Apr 184024.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 187156.4AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
4 Feb 187256.5Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
6 Aug 188469.1DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico de Giacomo:
Bishop Federico de Giacomo (born , died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 369
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015