Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giusto Cardinal Recanati, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1789Born
22 Feb 181222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jul 184858.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
9 Jul 184858.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tripolis in Phoenicia
22 Aug 184859.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Senigallia, Italy
5 Sep 185162.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Senigallia, Italy
7 Mar 185363.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 185363.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
17 Nov 186172.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

MicroData Summary for Giusto Recanati (VIAF: 89733114)
Giusto Cardinal Recanati O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Ssma. Concezione, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 512, and Page 567
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 35
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Mar 1853

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017