Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Tempesta, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Troia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1838Born
Apr 1855³16.5ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
15 Aug 186122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
22 Dec 188244.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aquino, Sora, e Pontecorvo, Italy
22 Dec 188244.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
31 Dec 188244.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
14 Mar 188748.5AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
4 Jun 189152.7AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
23 Apr 189960.6DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniele Tempesta
Bishop Daniele Tempesta O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Donato Val di Comino
Ordained BishopSan Francesco a Ripa, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 530, and Page 567
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 569
  • c34: CB, 3 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017